+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to withdraw from committee on Health Care failed.Ayes, 10; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/10/2016 8:20:08 AM)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor