+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2015.
- Chapter 22, 2014 Laws.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Komp, Thatcher, Thompson.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3283
2/11/2014 10:36:06 AM
Amendment #3282
2/11/2014 10:35:50 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor