+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Informational Meeting scheduled.
- Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/3/2020 11:21 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/4/2020 5:07 PM)