+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/4/2020 8:22 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/12/2020 1:01 PM)