+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, April 13, 2018.
- Chapter 122, 2018 Laws.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2018 Calendar.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/7/2018 10:38 AM)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor