+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, February 26, 2014.
- Chapter 3, 2014 Laws.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith.
- Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Weidner; Excused, 2--Davis, Matthews; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum, Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3040
2/4/2014 8:09:01 AM
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor