+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment -8
Proposed (2/10/2020 11:29 PM)
Amendment -11
Adopted (2/11/2020 10:00 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/10/2020 5:17 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/10/2020 5:17 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/10/2020 5:17 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/10/2020 5:17 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/10/2020 5:17 PM)