+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to refer to Health Care carried.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Winters.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (9)
Amendment -A13
Adopted (2/25/2016 1:43:29 PM)
Amendment -A12
Proposed (2/24/2016 5:01:26 PM)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (2/24/2016 5:01:26 PM)
Amendment -A7
Proposed (2/24/2016 5:01:26 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (2/9/2016 10:13:00 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/2/2016 2:31:43 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/2/2016 2:29:15 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/2/2016 11:20:15 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/2/2016 1:19:10 PM)