+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 3, 2022.
- Chapter 96, 2022 Laws.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Scharf.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/11/2022 4:36 PM)