+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 82, 2018 Laws.
- Effective date, April 3, 2018.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (2/20/2018 1:19 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/13/2018 3:19 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/9/2018 8:16 AM)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor