+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 81, 2018 Laws.
- Effective date, April 3, 2018.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Vote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
- Read. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Helfrich, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Failed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, Nearman, Nosse, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Vial, Wilson; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson.
- Nosse served notice of possible reconsideration.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Kruse, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Do pass w/amdts and referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. Amendments distributed.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/6/2018 9:25 AM)