+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 80, 2018 Laws.
- Effective date, June 2, 2018.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 24; Excused, 6--Gelser, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Education.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/5/2018 9:19 AM)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor