+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2019.
- Chapter 79, 2018 Laws.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) Amdendments distributed.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/2/2018 7:25 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor