+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/14/2018 3:00 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor