+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 2, 2018.
- Chapter 010, 2018 Laws.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A11
Adopted (2/26/2018 11:20 AM)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (2/23/2018 8:53 AM)
Amendment -8
Adopted (2/15/2018 2:38 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/14/2018 11:51 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/9/2018 8:03 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/8/2018 12:08 PM)
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor