+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 73, 2014 Laws.
- Effective date, March 13, 2014.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hicks. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Cameron, Freeman, Hanna, McLane, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2014 Calendar.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Burdick, Shields.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Burdick.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (18)
Amendment #3620
2/21/2014 10:00:40 AM
Amendment #3619
2/19/2014 4:56:25 PM
Amendment #3570
2/21/2014 10:00:40 AM
Amendment #3561
2/19/2014 4:56:59 PM
Amendment #3525
2/19/2014 4:56:59 PM
Amendment #3560
2/19/2014 4:56:25 PM
Amendment #3524
2/19/2014 4:56:25 PM
Amendment #3452
2/14/2014 10:31:48 AM
Amendment #3434
2/13/2014 12:16:30 PM
Amendment #3433
2/13/2014 12:16:30 PM
Amendment #3432
2/13/2014 12:16:30 PM
Amendment #3431
2/13/2014 12:16:30 PM
Amendment #3407
2/12/2014 5:36:36 PM
Amendment #3391
2/12/2014 3:10:26 PM
Amendment #3389
2/12/2014 3:10:26 PM
Amendment #3390
2/12/2014 3:10:26 PM
Amendment #3353
2/12/2014 7:30:40 AM
Amendment #3321
2/11/2014 1:45:32 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor