+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 6, 2014.
- Chapter 46, 2014 Laws.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor