+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 23, 2022.
- Chapter 90, 2022 Laws.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Cate, George, Goodwin, Levy, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Scharf.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2022 Calendar.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Informational Meeting held.
- Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/3/2022 1:09 PM)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (2/24/2022 9:19 AM)