+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, April 13, 2018.
- Chapter 121, 2018 Laws.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Olsen; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Helfrich.
- Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 8--Boone, Fahey, Gorsek, Helm, Hernandez, McKeown, Meek, Smith Warner.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A9
Adopted (3/1/2018 12:30 PM)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (2/28/2018 1:06 PM)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (2/22/2018 11:23 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/13/2018 2:08 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/13/2018 11:37:47 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2018 9:59 AM)