+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference.
- Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood, then Finance and Revenue.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/19/2016 3:45:02 PM)