+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 3, 2016.
- Chapter 018, 2016 Laws.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Gilliam, Gorsek, Vega Pederson; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Gomberg, Nearman, Read, Witt.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 23, 2016 Calendar.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 22, 2016 Calendar.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Winters.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce and General Government.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor