+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 13, 2014.
- Chapter 72, 2014 Laws.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hoyle.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Olsen, Winters.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor