+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr, Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gelser.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (2/21/2020 11:20 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/10/2020 12:04 PM)