+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 6, 2014.
- Chapter 115, 2014 Laws.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Clem.
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 55; Absent, 1--Richardson; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Harker, Olson.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2014 Calendar.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2014 Calendar.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #3610
2/18/2014 11:43:27 AM
Amendment #3611
2/18/2014 1:40:35 PM
Amendment #3488
2/18/2014 1:40:35 PM
Amendment #3609
2/18/2014 11:43:27 AM
Amendment #3486
2/18/2014 11:43:27 AM
Amendment #3487
2/18/2014 11:43:27 AM
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor