+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett.
- Hansell granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 25--Barreto, Barton, Bentz, Boone, Buehler, Esquivel, Greenlick, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Krieger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, McLane, Piluso, Post, Smith Warner, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 4--Davis, Gorsek, Komp, Olson.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Knopp; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Rules.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-17 by unanimous consent.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Education, then Ways and Means.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment A5
Adopted (2/26/2016 4:35:05 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/8/2016 12:16:19 PM)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor