+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 19, 2014 Laws.
- Effective date, March 3, 2014.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hicks.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #3534
2/20/2014 7:52:41 AM
Amendment #3352
2/11/2014 6:16:20 PM
Amendment #3257
2/11/2014 7:09:17 AM
Amendment #3256
2/11/2014 7:09:17 AM
Amendment #3255
2/11/2014 7:09:17 AM
Amendment #3029
Proposed
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor