+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2019.
- Chapter 76, 2018 Laws.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Monnes Anderson granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
- Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Monnes Anderson; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Monnes Anderson.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, Winters. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment -A17
Adopted (2/27/2018 11:35 AM)
Amendment -A10
Proposed (2/22/2018 12:20 PM)
Amendment -A11
Proposed (2/22/2018 1:55 PM)
Amendment -A 10
Proposed (2/22/2018 12:20:08 PM)
Amendment -9
Adopted (2/14/2018 5:54 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (2/14/2018 11:13 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/6/2018 4:24 PM)