+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2015.
- Chapter 44, 2014 Laws.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 9--Barnhart, Freeman, Gelser, Keny-Guyer, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Tomei.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Monroe declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3122
2/6/2014 10:12:17 AM
Amendment #3024
2/3/2014 2:04:26 PM
Amendment #3057
2/4/2014 1:07:20 PM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor