+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 71, 2014 Laws.
- Effective date, March 13, 2014.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Olsen.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2014 Calendar.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Olsen.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #3531
2/19/2014 5:18:55 PM
Amendment #3559
2/19/2014 5:18:55 PM
Amendment #3201
2/10/2014 10:50:04 AM
Amendment #3165
2/10/2014 7:54:19 AM
Amendment #3164
2/10/2014 7:54:19 AM
Amendment #3050
2/4/2014 11:10:12 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor