+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Boles, Findley granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boles, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Olsen.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner, President Courtney; Excused, 1--Olsen.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-19 Calendar and placed on 02-20 Calendar by unanimous consent.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng).
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment -A13
Adopted (2/28/2020 9:05 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/12/2020 3:55 PM)
Amendment -A10
Proposed (2/25/2020 1:41 PM)
Amendment -A12
Proposed (2/28/2020 9:05 AM)
Amendment -MR4
Proposed (2/14/2020 2:02 PM)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (2/25/2020 1:41 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/12/2020 3:55 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/11/2020 11:56 AM)