+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Housing and Development.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.