+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/4/2020 7:59 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/4/2020 7:58 AM)