+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Burdick.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/3/2020 4:58 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/5/2020 3:53 PM)