+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 058, 2016 Laws.
- Effective date, January 1, 2017.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barreto, Weidner; Excused, 2--Bentz, Komp.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 3--Boquist, Johnson, Winters.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-15 by unanimous consent.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-12 by unanimous consent.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.