+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 13, 2014.
- Chapter 70, 2014 Laws.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gallegos. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Berger, Conger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
- Second reading.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3672
2/27/2014 11:48:50 AM
Amendment #3594
2/21/2014 4:59:17 PM
Amendment #3275
2/11/2014 10:25:27 AM
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor