+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 16, 2018.
- Chapter 039, 2018 Laws.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley, Roblan.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/1/2018 3:56 PM)