+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date, March 13, 2014.
- Chapter 69, 2014 Laws.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Boquist, Whitsett.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Barton, Unger, Whitsett, Witt; Excused, 2--Hicks, Lively.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3592
2/21/2014 4:50:31 PM
Amendment #3218
2/10/2014 11:08:08 AM
Amendment #3123
2/6/2014 10:20:31 AM
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor