+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, April 3, 2018.
- Chapter 72, 2018 Laws.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barnhart, Holvey; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Dembrow, Frederick, Riley; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Rules.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (3/1/2018 12:30 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/9/2018 4:01 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/7/2018 10:36 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/29/2018 9:01 AM)