+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- Informational Meeting scheduled.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/5/2018 6:16 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor