+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2019.
- Chapter 100, 2018 Laws.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/5/2018 10:19 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/2/2018 4:54 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/2/2018 1:05 PM)