+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Wildfire Reduction and Recovery, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/11/2020 11:40 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/11/2020 5:42 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/6/2020 10:15 AM)