+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2019.
- Chapter 71, 2018 Laws.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Amendments distributed.
- Second reading.
- Johnson declared potential conflict of interest.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (2/28/2018 11:27 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/6/2018 4:17 PM)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor