+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Informational Meeting held.
- Referred to Wildfire Reduction and Recovery.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/4/2020 6:09 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/6/2020 10:14 AM)