+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Informational Meeting held.
- Referred to Wildfire Reduction and Recovery, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/7/2020 9:03 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/10/2020 12:32 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/4/2020 6:07 PM)