+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #3380
2/12/2014 12:12:07 PM
Amendment #3299
2/11/2014 11:07:43 AM
Amendment #3378
2/12/2014 11:34:36 AM
Amendment #3194
2/10/2014 9:52:21 AM
Amendment #3031
2/3/2014 4:49:30 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor