+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 3, 2022.
- Chapter 21, 2022 Laws.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
- Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--George, Zika.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 22; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 7--Boquist, Kennemer, Lawrence Spence, Linthicum, Robinson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher.
- Second reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/1/2022 4:49 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/2/2022 7:28 AM)