+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (2/25/2018 7:51 AM)
Amendment A4
Adopted (2/25/2018 7:51:53 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/13/2018 11:22 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/7/2018 10:19 AM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor