+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Public Hearing held.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan, President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boles, Findley, Girod, Olsen; Excused, 1--Gelser.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/10/2020 10:51 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/3/2020 4:39 PM)