+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 315, 2017 Laws.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 2--Dembrow, Johnson.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.