+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 2, 2015.
- Chapter 228, 2015 Laws.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Bentz; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2015 Calendar.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-07 by unanimous consent.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #
3/24/2015 9:18:43 AM
Amendment #4712
3/24/2015 9:18:43 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor